Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacek Kiciński, C.M.F.

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Titular Bishop of Margum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1968 BornTurek
1989²20.3ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
8 Sep 199325.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
27 May 199526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
13 Feb 201647.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
13 Feb 201647.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Margum
19 Mar 201647.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Margum

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacek Kiciński
Bishop Jacek Kiciński C.M.F. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 13 Feb 2016
  • c2+: CB, 18 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016