Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Rybak

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Legnica, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1929Born
2 Aug 195323.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Apr 197747.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
28 Apr 197747.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Benepota
24 Jun 197747.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benepota
25 Mar 199262.3AppointedBishop of Legnica, Poland
19 Mar 200575.3RetiredBishop of Legnica, Poland
7 Mar 201787.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Legnica, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Rybak (VIAF: 302603837)
Bishop Tadeusz Rybak (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Legnica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilanówek
Ordained BishopSt. Jean Baptiste, Cathedral, Wrocław, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,826
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast