Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Engelbert Barbo von Waxenstein

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Titular Bishop of Dara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1663¹BornLjubljana
20 May 168724.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 Mar 168825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
4 Jun 170340.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
4 Jun 170340.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dara
20 Feb 170441.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dara
25 Dec 170643.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Engelbert Barbo von Waxenstein:
Bishop Franz Engelbert Barbo von Waxenstein (born 1663, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 18.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 182
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015