Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wacław Legnicki

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1348²Born
3 Dec 137527.9AppointedBishop of Lebus, Germany
19 Apr 138234.2AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
1417¹69.0ResignedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
30 Dec 141971.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wacław Legnicki (VIAF: 23081744)
Bishop Wacław Legnicki (born 1348, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 28 Jan 2016