Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin Wojciech

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Titular Bishop of Danaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1868BornGrzawa
11 Jun 189426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
8 Mar 192052.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
8 Mar 192052.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Danaba
1 May 192052.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Danaba
29 May 194072.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Valentin Wojciech:
Bishop Valentin Wojciech (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013