Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan von Sitsch

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1552Born
18 Jul 160047.9AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
23 Sep 160149.0Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
25 Apr 160855.6DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan von Sitsch (VIAF: 50074102)
Bishop Jan von Sitsch (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŚciborzu

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337
  • ob/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast