Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Gleich

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Mallus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1815Born
30 Sep 183823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
10 Aug 187559.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
10 Aug 187559.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mallus
12 Sep 187560.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mallus
2 Apr 190084.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Hermann Gleich (VIAF: 206318063)
Bishop Hermann Gleich (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaskowitz, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
Ordained BishopChurch, Janemig

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017