Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf von Rüdesheim

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1402¹Born
26 Sep 146361.7AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
20 Jan 146866.0SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
27 Apr 146866.3ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
17 Jan 148280.0DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rudolf von Rüdesheim
Bishop Rudolf von Rüdesheim (born 1402, died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 174, and Page 270
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1463, Number 46*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast