Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Knauer

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1764BornRothflössel
7 Mar 178924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
27 Aug 184176.7SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
27 Jan 184378.1ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
23 Apr 184378.3Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
16 May 184479.4DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Josef Knauer (VIAF: 10617488)
Bishop Josef Knauer (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016