Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giorgio Zur

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Austria

Titular Archbishop of Sesta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1930Born
10 Oct 195525.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 197948.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sesta
5 Feb 197948.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Malawi
5 Feb 197948.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Zambia
24 Feb 197949.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sesta
3 May 198555.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
13 Aug 199060.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to India
13 Aug 199060.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Nepal
7 Dec 199868.8AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
29 Jan 200069.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Russian Federation
8 Oct 200272.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
26 Jul 200575.4RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Austria
8 Jan 201988.8DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Austria

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Zur (VIAF: 216813390)
Archbishop Giorgio Zur (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Austria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceG÷rlitz, Germany
Death PlaceCasa Santa Marta, Vatican City, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • loc: CB, 8 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2019

Quantcast