Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Cedzich, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prelate of Alto Paraná, Paraguay

Titular Bishop of Buxentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1911Born
18 Apr 193725.5Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
22 May 193725.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of the Divine Word
19 Aug 193725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
11 May 196856.6AppointedPrelate of Alto Paraná, Paraguay
11 May 196856.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Buxentum
23 Jun 196856.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buxentum
22 Dec 197160.2DiedPrelate of Alto Paraná, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Cedzich (VIAF: 310610644)
Bishop Franciszek Cedzich S.V.D. (born , died ) Prelate of Alto Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDollna, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Encarnación, Territorial Prelature of Encarnación
Death PlaceAsunción, Archdiocese of Asunción
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Puerto Stroessner, Territorial Prelature of Alto Paraná

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1971
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Jan 2019

Quantcast