Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Joseph von Aulock

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1771BornSeichwitz
21 Mar 179523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
13 Mar 182654.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
13 Mar 182654.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
18 Jun 182654.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
3 May 183058.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Karl Joseph von Aulock
Bishop Karl Joseph von Aulock (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jun 2016