Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacy Ludwik Jeż

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1914BornRadomysl Wielki
20 Jun 193722.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Apr 196045.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
20 Apr 196045.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Alba Maritima
5 Jun 196045.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alba Maritima
196752.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
28 Jun 197257.9AppointedBishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
1 Feb 199277.5RetiredBishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
16 Oct 200793.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Ludwik Jeż:
Bishop Ignacy Ludwik Jeż (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

  • a priest for 70.3 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c4 (c3?): Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 64
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013