Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Pluta

Deceased

Bishop of Gorzów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1910BornKochlowice
24 Jun 193424.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 195848.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
4 Jul 195848.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
7 Sep 195848.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
28 Jun 197262.4AppointedBishop of Gorzów, Poland
22 Jan 198676.0DiedBishop of Gorzów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Pluta:
Bishop Wilhelm Pluta (born , died ) Bishop of Gorzów

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015