Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jodok z Rożemberka (von Rosenberg), O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1430¹Born
1453¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
9 Jun 145626.4AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
11 Dec 145727.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
15 Dec 146738.0DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jodok z Rożemberka (von Rosenberg):
Bishop Jodok z Rożemberka (von Rosenberg) O.S.Io.Hieros. (died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 15.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,918
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,608
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013