Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Bosbach Ursinus

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Nestum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1569Born
19 Sep 159223.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 161444.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 Jul 161444.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Nestum
27 Nov 161445.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Nestum
16 Nov 161546.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Franz Bosbach Ursinus
Bishop Franz Bosbach Ursinus (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlogau
Ordained BishopStahov, Abbey, Praha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
Death PlaceBreslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 23.1 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 259
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,896
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 35
  • b/c2: CB, 18 Jan 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast