Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspar von Logau

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524¹Born
13 Mar 156036.1AppointedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
17 Apr 156238.2AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
4 Jun 157450.4DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kaspar von Logau (VIAF: 61941031)
Bishop Kaspar von Logau (born 1524, died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNysa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337, and Page 169
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast