Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Hanisch, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Umtata

Titular Bishop of Gor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1882BornAlt Lomnitz / Stara Lomnica
4 Jul 190826.5Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
28 Oct 193048.8AppointedPrefect of Umtata, South Africa
13 Apr 193755.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gor
13 Apr 193755.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Umtata, South Africa
29 Jun 193755.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gor
28 Feb 194058.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Umtata, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Hanisch:
Bishop Emmanuel Hanisch M.H.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Umtata

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013