Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franz Ludwig am Rhein zu Neuburg

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Mainz

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1664BornNeuburg/Donau
30 Jun 168318.9SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
26 Aug 168319.1ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
8 Jun 169429.9AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
5 Nov 171046.3SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mainz, Germany
5 Oct 171248.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mainz, Germany
20 Feb 171651.6SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
23 Dec 171652.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
30 Jan 172964.5SucceededArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
3 Mar 172964.6ResignedArchbishop-Elect of Trier, Germany
18 Apr 173267.7DiedArchbishop-Elect of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Ludwig am Rhein zu Neuburg:
Priest Franz Ludwig am Rhein zu Neuburg (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Mainz

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013