Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Weisskopf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534¹Born
17 Dec 157642.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
17 Dec 157642.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
8 Sep 157743.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
1602¹68.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
10 Dec 160571.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Weisskopf (VIAF: 247471960)
Bishop Adam Weisskopf (born 1534, died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 258
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Nov 2017