Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Feliks Cieplak

Deceased

Archbishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1857BornDabrowa Gomicza
24 Jul 188123.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 190850.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
16 Jul 190850.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
20 Dec 190851.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
29 Mar 191961.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
5 Jul 192365.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mohilev, Belarus
14 Dec 192568.3AppointedArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 Feb 192668.5DiedArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Jan Feliks Cieplak:
Archbishop Jan Feliks Cieplak (born , died ) Archbishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 35
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013