Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Georg Cardinal von Kopp

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1837BornDuderstadt
28 Aug 186225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
15 Nov 188144.3AppointedBishop of Fulda, Germany
27 Dec 188144.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
9 Aug 188750.0AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
16 Jan 189355.5Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 189355.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
4 Mar 191476.6DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Georg von Kopp:
Cardinal Georg von Kopp (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
  • a cardinal for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 277, and Page 595
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013