Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Thurzó

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1464¹Born
11 Mar 150237.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 Jul 150339.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 Jan 150641.7SucceededBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
22 Mar 150641.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
2 Aug 152056.2DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Thurzó (VIAF: 167794322)
Bishop Jan Thurzó (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Ordained BishopCathedral, Breslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1506, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 May 2018

Quantcast