Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joachim Cardinal Meisner

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1933Born
8 Apr 196228.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
22 Dec 196228.9Ordained PriestPriest of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
17 Mar 197541.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
17 Mar 197541.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vina
17 May 197541.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vina
22 Apr 198046.3AppointedBishop of Berlin, Germany
17 May 198046.3InstalledBishop of Berlin, Germany
2 Feb 198349.1Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198349.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
20 Dec 198854.9AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Feb 198955.1InstalledArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
28 Feb 201480.1RetiredArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
5 Jul 201783.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joachim Meisner (VIAF: 49269588)
Joachim Cardinal Meisner (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreslau-Lissa, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
Ordained DeaconSt. Marien, Church, Neuzelle
Ordained PriestSankt Marien, Cathedral, Erfurt, Apostolic Administration of Erfurt-Meiningen
Ordained BishopSankt Marien, Cathedral, Erfurt, Apostolic Administration of Erfurt-Meiningen
Death PlaceBad Füssing

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
  • a cardinal for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 18 Sep 2017