Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jerzy Stroba

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1919Born
19 Dec 194223.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 195838.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
4 Jul 195838.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradus
16 Nov 195838.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradus
16 Oct 196747.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
28 Jun 197252.5AppointedBishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
21 Sep 197858.7AppointedArchbishop of Poznań, Poland
11 Apr 199676.3RetiredArchbishop of Poznań, Poland
12 May 199979.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Stroba
Archbishop Jerzy Stroba (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSwietochlowice

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast