Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Wronka

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Titular Bishop of Vatarba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1897BornBiskupice Zabaryczne
26 May 192325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
30 May 195759.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
30 May 195759.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vatarba
29 Dec 195760.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vatarba
16 Oct 196769.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
29 Aug 197476.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Wronka:
Bishop Andrzej Wronka (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015