Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leopold Wilhelm von Österreich

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Passau

Bishop of Halberstadt

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

Administrator of Strasbourg

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1614BornWiener Neustadt
8 Nov 162511.8SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
1 Feb 162612.0ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
10 Oct 162612.7AppointedAdministrator of Strasbourg, France
24 Dec 162713.9AppointedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
16 Nov 163723.8SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
28 Sep 163824.7ConfirmedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
21 Jan 165642.0AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 Nov 166248.8DiedBishop-Elect of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Leopold Wilhelm von Österreich:
Father Leopold Wilhelm von Österreich (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Passau

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 94
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015