Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Maurycy von Strachwitz

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Wrocław (Breslau)

Titular Bishop of Tiberias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1721BornFreyhan
15 Feb 174423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
6 Apr 176140.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
6 Apr 176140.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
17 May 176140.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
4 Apr 176645.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
28 Jan 178159.9DiedApostolic Administrator of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Maurycy von Strachwitz:
Bishop Jan Maurycy von Strachwitz (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015