Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp Gotthard von Schaffgotsch

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): (limited jurisdiction from 4 IV 1766)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1716³Born
4 Oct 173822.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
4 Mar 174831.7AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
1 May 174831.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
5 Jan 179578.5DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philipp Gotthard von Schaffgotsch (VIAF: 47196780)
Bishop Philipp Gotthard von Schaffgotsch (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarmbrunn

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1748, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022