Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Pietrulla, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tubarão, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1906BornKnurow, Poland
21 May 193225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Dec 194741.3AppointedPrelate of Santarém, Para, Brazil
13 Dec 194741.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Conana
8 Feb 194841.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Conana
18 Jun 194942.8AppointedBishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
11 May 195548.7AppointedBishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
17 Sep 198175.0RetiredBishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
25 May 199285.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Pietrulla:
Bishop Anselmo Pietrulla O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tubarão

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013