Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold Sedlnitzky Odrowąż von Choltitz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau)

Note/Previous Titular See: (left the church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1787BornGeppersdorf
8 Jun 181123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
27 Oct 183548.2SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
11 Jul 183649.0ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
18 Sep 183649.1Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
10 Oct 184053.2ResignedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
25 Mar 187183.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Leopold Sedlnitzky Odrowąż von Choltitz:
Bishop Leopold Sedlnitzky Odrowąż von Choltitz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013