Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pawel Latusek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Titular Bishop of Anineta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1910BornTychy
30 Jun 193525.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 196151.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
13 Nov 196151.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Anineta
11 Feb 196251.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anineta
28 Jun 197262.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
16 Feb 197362.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Pawel Latusek:
Bishop Pawel Latusek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015