Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Jerin

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540¹Born
1 Jul 158545.5SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
9 Sep 158545.6ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
9 Feb 158646.1Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
5 Nov 159656.8DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andreas Jerin (VIAF: 64817337)
Bishop Andreas Jerin (born 1540, died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchwabish Ginsend, Diocese of Augsburg, Germany
Ordained BishopBreslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast