Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Balthasar Liesch von Hornau

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1592Born
26 Aug 161927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
6 Nov 162533.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
6 Nov 162533.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
25 Mar 162633.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
13 Sep 166169.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Johann Balthasar Liesch von Hornau (VIAF: 74928047)
Bishop Johann Balthasar Liesch von Hornau (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerching

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 259
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast