Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Karl von Hohenzollern-Hechingen

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1732³BornFreiburg
1 Jun 177744.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
29 Jun 177744.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
20 Jul 177845.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
20 Jul 177845.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
4 Oct 177846.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
31 Jan 178552.5SucceededBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
16 Jul 179562.9SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
18 Dec 179563.3ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
10 Apr 179663.7InstalledBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
11 Aug 180371.0DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Karl von Hohenzollern-Hechingen:
Bishop Johann Karl von Hohenzollern-Hechingen (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 189, and Page 195
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 432

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015