Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltazar von Promnitz

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1488¹Born
18 Sep 153951.7SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 Apr 154052.3ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
20 Jan 156274.0DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltazar von Promnitz (VIAF: 84136120)
Bishop Baltazar von Promnitz (born 1488, died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast