Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Herzog

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1823Born
17 Jun 184825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
24 Mar 188259.1AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 May 188259.2Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
26 Dec 188663.8DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Robert Herzog (VIAF: 100500737)
Bishop Robert Herzog (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchönwalde, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Breslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 595
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017