Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henryk Grzondziel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Titular Bishop of Athribis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1897Born
17 Mar 192325.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 195961.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
20 May 195961.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Athribis
16 Aug 195962.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athribis
24 May 196870.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Henryk Grzondziel (VIAF: 5908321)
Bishop Henryk Grzondziel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZalezie

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast