Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Atanazy Kloske

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

Titular Bishop of Theodosiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1852BornKlein-Nimsdorf [Naczyslawice]
15 Jul 187725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
29 Dec 191059.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
29 Dec 191059.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis
19 Feb 191159.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis
12 May 192573.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Atanazy Kloske:
Bishop Wilhelm Atanazy Kloske (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,810
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,868
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013