Rank V Birthdate Age Elevated Yrs This Title Yrs Name Cardinal Title
13 No 25 Jan 1929 94.8
2 Feb 1983 40.8
2 Feb 1983 40.8
Michael Michai Cardinal Kitbunchu San Lorenzo in Panisperna
14 No 1 Mar 1925 98.7
2 Feb 1983 40.8
2 Feb 1983 40.8
Alexandre Cardinal do Nascimento San Marco in Agro Laurentino
15 No 20 Mar 1930 93.6
2 Feb 1983 40.8
2 Feb 1983 40.8
Thomas Stafford Cardinal Williams Gesù Divin Maestro alla Pineta Sacchetti
16 No 30 Aug 1930 93.2
25 May 1985 38.4
29 Jan 1996 27.8
Paul Joseph Jean Cardinal Poupard Santa Prassede
17 No 20 Feb 1928 95.7
25 May 1985 38.4
25 May 1985 38.4
Friedrich Cardinal Wetter Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
18 No 31 Oct 1936 87.0
28 Jun 1991 32.4
28 Jun 1991 32.4
Nicolás de Jesús Cardinal López Rodríguez San Pio X alla Balduina
19 No 27 Feb 1936 87.7
28 Jun 1991 32.4
28 Jun 1991 32.4
Roger Michael Cardinal Mahony Santi Quattro Coronati
20 No 19 Feb 1931 92.7
28 Jun 1991 32.4
28 Jun 1991 32.4
Camillo Cardinal Ruini Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
21 No 20 Dec 1934 88.9
26 Nov 1994 28.9
26 Nov 1994 28.9
Julius Riyadi Cardinal Darmaatmadja , S.J.Sacro Cuore di Maria
22 No 15 Dec 1926 96.9
26 Nov 1994 28.9
26 Nov 1994 28.9
Emmanuel Cardinal Wamala Sant’Ugo
23 No 18 Mar 1930 93.6
26 Nov 1994 28.9
26 Nov 1994 28.9
Adam Joseph Cardinal Maida Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio
24 Yes 8 Sep 1945 78.2
26 Nov 1994 28.9
26 Nov 1994 28.9
Vinko Cardinal Puljić Santa Chiara a Vigna Clara
25 No 28 Mar 1933 90.6
26 Nov 1994 28.9
26 Nov 1994 28.9
Juan Cardinal Sandoval Íñiguez Nostra Signora di Guadalupe e San Filippo Martire
26 No 26 Jul 1932 91.3
21 Feb 1998 25.7
1 Mar 2008 15.7
James Francis Cardinal Stafford San Pietro in Montorio
27 No 6 Sep 1930 93.2
21 Feb 1998 25.7
21 Feb 1998 25.7
Salvatore Cardinal De Giorgi Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
28 No 20 Aug 1936 87.2
21 Feb 1998 25.7
21 Feb 1998 25.7
Antonio María Cardinal Rouco Varela San Lorenzo in Damaso
29 Yes 5 Aug 1944 79.2
21 Feb 1998 25.7
21 Feb 1998 25.7
Polycarp Cardinal Pengo Nostra Signora de La Salette
30 Yes 22 Jan 1945 78.8
21 Feb 1998 25.7
21 Feb 1998 25.7
Christoph Cardinal Schönborn , O.P.Gesù Divin Lavoratore
31 No 6 Jun 1942 81.4
21 Feb 1998 25.7
21 Feb 1998 25.7
Norberto Cardinal Rivera Carrera San Francesco d’Assisi a Ripa Grande
32 No 14 Nov 1930 93.0
21 Feb 1998 25.7
21 Feb 2001 22.7
Jānis Cardinal Pujats Santa Silvia
33 No 11 Apr 1931 92.6
21 Feb 2001 22.7
21 Feb 2011 12.7
Sergio Cardinal Sebastiani Sant’Eustachio
34 No 2 Jun 1943 80.4
21 Feb 2001 22.7
20 May 2006 17.5
Crescenzio Cardinal Sepe Dio Padre misericordioso
35 No 5 Mar 1933 90.7
21 Feb 2001 22.7
21 Feb 2011 12.7
Walter Cardinal Kasper Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova
36 No 13 Sep 1932 91.1
21 Feb 2001 22.7
21 Feb 2001 22.7
Pedro Cardinal Rubiano Sàenz Trasfigurazione di Nostro Signore Gesù Cristo
37 No 1 Feb 1937 86.8
21 Feb 2001 22.7
21 Feb 2001 22.7
Audrys Juozas Cardinal Bačkis Natività di Nostro Signore Gesù Cristo a Via Gallia
38 No 5 Sep 1933 90.2
21 Feb 2001 22.7
21 Feb 2001 22.7
Francisco Javier Cardinal Errázuriz Ossa , P. SchönstattSanta Maria della Pace
39 No 8 Mar 1941 82.7
21 Feb 2001 22.7
21 Feb 2001 22.7
Wilfrid Fox Cardinal Napier , O.F.M.San Francesco d’Assisi ad Acilia
40 No 29 Dec 1942 80.9
21 Feb 2001 22.7
21 Feb 2001 22.7
Óscar Andrés Cardinal Rodríguez Maradiaga , S.D.B.Santa Maria della Speranza
41 Yes 28 Dec 1943 79.9
21 Feb 2001 22.7
21 Feb 2001 22.7
Juan Luis Cardinal Cipriani Thorne San Camillo de Lellis
42 No 31 Mar 1930 93.6
21 Oct 2003 20.0
12 Jun 2014 9.4
Julián Cardinal Herranz Casado Sant’Eugenio
43 No 7 Nov 1941 82.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
Angelo Cardinal Scola Santi XII Apostoli
44 No 16 Jun 1936 87.4
21 Oct 2003 20.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
Anthony Olubunmi Cardinal Okogie Beata Vergine Maria del Monte Carmelo a Mostacciano
45 No 27 Feb 1941 82.7
21 Oct 2003 20.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
Gabriel Cardinal Zubeir Wako Sant’Atanasio a Via Tiburtina
46 No 19 Apr 1935 88.5
21 Oct 2003 20.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
Justin Francis Cardinal Rigali Santa Prisca
47 No 18 Nov 1936 87.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
Ennio Cardinal Antonelli Sant’Andrea delle Fratte
48 Yes 11 Oct 1948 75.1
21 Oct 2003 20.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
Peter Kodwo Appiah Cardinal Turkson San Liborio
49 Yes 20 Mar 1949 74.6
21 Oct 2003 20.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
Josip Cardinal Bozanić San Girolamo dei Croati
50 No 5 Mar 1934 89.7
21 Oct 2003 20.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
Jean-Baptiste Cardinal Phạm Minh Mẫn San Giustino
51 Yes 17 Oct 1950 73.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
21 Oct 2003 20.0
Philippe Xavier Christian Ignace Marie Cardinal Barbarin Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
52 Yes 25 Jun 1952 71.4
21 Oct 2003 20.0
29 Mar 2023 .6
Péter Cardinal Erdő Santa Maria Nuova
53 No 23 Sep 1934 89.1
24 Mar 2006 17.6
20 Jun 2016 7.4
Franc Cardinal Rodé , C.M.San Francesco Saverio alla Garbatella
54 No 17 Apr 1940 83.5
24 Mar 2006 17.6
24 Feb 2009 14.7
Agostino Cardinal Vallini San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo
55 No 10 Aug 1932 91.2
24 Mar 2006 17.6
24 Mar 2006 17.6
Gaudencio Borbon Cardinal Rosales Santissimo Nome di Maria in Via Latina
56 Yes 26 Sep 1944 79.1
24 Mar 2006 17.6
24 Mar 2006 17.6
Jean-Pierre Bernard Cardinal Ricard Sant’Agostino
57 Yes 15 Oct 1945 78.1
24 Mar 2006 17.6
24 Mar 2006 17.6
Antonio Cardinal Cañizares Llovera San Pancrazio
58 Yes 29 Jun 1944 79.4
24 Mar 2006 17.6
24 Mar 2006 17.6
Seán Patrick Cardinal O’Malley , O.F.M. Cap.Santa Maria della Vittoria
59 No 27 Apr 1939 84.5
24 Mar 2006 17.6
24 Mar 2006 17.6
Stanisław Cardinal Dziwisz Santa Maria del Popolo
60 No 13 Jan 1932 91.8
24 Mar 2006 17.6
24 Mar 2006 17.6
Joseph Cardinal Zen Ze-kiun , S.D.B.Santa Maria Madre del Redentore a Tor Bella Monaca
61 No 3 Jan 1935 88.8
24 Nov 2007 15.9
19 May 2018 5.5
Giovanni Cardinal Lajolo Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio
62 No 5 Sep 1934 89.2
24 Nov 2007 15.9
19 May 2018 5.5
Paul Josef Cardinal Cordes San Lorenzo in Piscibus
63 No 17 Sep 1943 80.1
24 Nov 2007 15.9
19 May 2018 5.5
Angelo Cardinal Comastri San Salvatore in Lauro
64 Yes 4 Jul 1945 78.3
24 Nov 2007 15.9
19 May 2018 5.5
Stanisław Cardinal Ryłko Sacro Cuore di Cristo Re
65 No 24 Sep 1933 90.1
24 Nov 2007 15.9
19 May 2018 5.5
Raffaele Cardinal Farina , S.D.B.San Giovanni della Pigna
66 No 16 Aug 1939 84.2
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
Seán Baptist Cardinal Brady Santi Quirico e Giulitta
67 No 29 Apr 1937 86.5
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
Lluís Cardinal Martínez Sistach San Sebastiano alle Catacombe
68 No 7 Nov 1942 81.0
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
André Armand Cardinal Vingt-Trois San Luigi dei Francesi
69 No 14 Jan 1943 80.8
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
Angelo Cardinal Bagnasco Gran Madre di Dio
70 No 28 Nov 1936 86.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
Théodore-Adrien Cardinal Sarr Santa Lucia a Piazza d’Armi
71 Yes 24 Dec 1944 78.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
Oswald Cardinal Gracias San Paolo della Croce a “Corviale”
72 Yes 2 Mar 1949 74.7
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
José Francisco Cardinal Robles Ortega Santa Maria della Presentazione
73 Yes 23 May 1949 74.5
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
Daniel Nicholas Cardinal DiNardo Sant’Eusebio
74 Yes 21 Sep 1949 74.1
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
Odilo Pedro Cardinal Scherer Sant’Andrea al Quirinale
75 Yes 1944 79.8
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
John Cardinal Njue Preziosissimo Sangue di Nostro Signore Gesù Cristo
76 No 7 Feb 1926 97.7
24 Nov 2007 15.9
24 Nov 2007 15.9
Estanislao Esteban Cardinal Karlic Beata Maria Vergine Addolorata a piazza Buenos Aires
77 No 8 Jun 1938 85.4
20 Nov 2010 13.0
3 May 2021 2.5
Angelo Cardinal Amato , S.D.B.Santa Maria in Aquiro
78 Yes 15 Jun 1945 78.4
20 Nov 2010 13.0
3 May 2021 2.5
Robert Cardinal Sarah San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana
79 No 28 May 1934 89.4
20 Nov 2010 13.0
3 May 2021 2.5
Francesco Cardinal Monterisi San Paolo alla Regola
80 Yes 30 Jun 1948 75.3
20 Nov 2010 13.0
3 May 2021 2.5
Raymond Leo Cardinal Burke Sant’Agata de’ Goti
81 Yes 15 Mar 1950 73.6
20 Nov 2010 13.0
3 May 2021 2.5
Kurt Cardinal Koch Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore
82 Yes 15 Sep 1944 79.1
20 Nov 2010 13.0
3 May 2021 2.5
Mauro Cardinal Piacenza San Paolo alle Tre Fontane
83 No 18 Oct 1942 81.0
20 Nov 2010 13.0
3 May 2021 2.5
Gianfranco Cardinal Ravasi San Giorgio in Velabro
84 No 20 Feb 1938 85.7
20 Nov 2010 13.0
20 Nov 2010 13.0
Paolo Cardinal Romeo Santa Maria Odigitria dei Siciliani
85 No 12 Nov 1940 83.0
20 Nov 2010 13.0
20 Nov 2010 13.0
Donald William Cardinal Wuerl San Pietro in Vincoli
86 No 15 Feb 1937 86.7
20 Nov 2010 13.0
20 Nov 2010 13.0
Raymundo Cardinal Damasceno Assis Immacolata al Tiburtino
87 Yes 1 Feb 1950 73.8
20 Nov 2010 13.0
20 Nov 2010 13.0
Kazimierz Cardinal Nycz Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
88 Yes 15 Nov 1947 76.0
20 Nov 2010 13.0
20 Nov 2010 13.0
Albert Malcolm Ranjith Cardinal Patabendige Don San Lorenzo in Lucina
89 Yes 21 Sep 1953 70.1
20 Nov 2010 13.0
20 Nov 2010 13.0
Reinhard Cardinal Marx San Corbiniano
90 No 5 Jan 1929 94.8
20 Nov 2010 13.0
3 May 2021 2.5
Walter Cardinal Brandmüller San Giuliano dei Fiamminghi
91 No 29 Mar 1938 85.6
18 Feb 2012 11.7
4 Mar 2022 1.7
Manuel Cardinal Monteiro de Castro San Domenico di Guzman
92 No 21 Sep 1935 88.1
18 Feb 2012 11.7
4 Mar 2022 1.7
Santos Cardinal Abril y Castelló San Ponziano
93 No 3 Feb 1938 85.8
18 Feb 2012 11.7
4 Mar 2022 1.7
Antonio Maria Cardinal Vegliò San Cesareo in Palatio
94 No 1 Oct 1942 81.1
18 Feb 2012 11.7
4 Mar 2022 1.7
Giuseppe Cardinal Bertello Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
95 No 6 Mar 1938 85.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
4 Mar 2022 1.7
Francesco Cardinal Coccopalmerio San Giuseppe dei Falegnami
96 Yes 24 Apr 1947 76.5
18 Feb 2012 11.7
4 Mar 2022 1.7
João Cardinal Bráz de Aviz Sant’Elena fuori Porta Prenestina
97 No 8 Apr 1939 84.6
18 Feb 2012 11.7
4 Mar 2022 1.7
Edwin Frederick Cardinal O’Brien San Sebastiano al Palatino
98 No 3 Feb 1943 80.8
18 Feb 2012 11.7
4 Mar 2022 1.7
Domenico Cardinal Calcagno Annunciazione della Beata Vergine Maria a Via Ardeatina
99 No 30 Jul 1943 80.3
18 Feb 2012 11.7
4 Mar 2022 1.7
Giuseppe Cardinal Versaldi Sacro Cuore di Gesù a Castro Pretorio
100 Yes 19 Apr 1945 78.5
18 Feb 2012 11.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
George Cardinal Alencherry San Bernardo alle Terme
101 Yes 16 Jan 1947 76.8
18 Feb 2012 11.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
Thomas Christopher Cardinal Collins San Patrizio
102 No 26 Apr 1943 80.5
18 Feb 2012 11.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
Dominik Jaroslav Cardinal Duka , O.P.Santi Marcellino e Pietro
103 Yes 22 Jun 1953 70.4
18 Feb 2012 11.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
Willem Jacobus Cardinal Eijk San Callisto
104 Yes 25 Feb 1947 76.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
Giuseppe Cardinal Betori San Marcello
105 Yes 6 Feb 1950 73.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
Timothy Michael Cardinal Dolan Nostra Signora di Guadalupe a Monte Mario
106 Yes 18 Aug 1956 67.2
18 Feb 2012 11.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
Rainer Maria Cardinal Woelki San Giovanni Maria Vianney
107 No 31 Jul 1939 84.3
18 Feb 2012 11.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
John Cardinal Tong Hon Regina Apostolorum
108 No 23 May 1931 92.5
18 Feb 2012 11.7
18 Feb 2012 11.7
Lucian Cardinal Mureşan Sant’Atanasio
109 Yes 15 Jun 1959 64.4
24 Nov 2012 10.9
24 Nov 2012 10.9
Baselios Cleemis (Isaac) Cardinal Thottunkal San Gregorio VII
110 Yes 29 Jan 1944 79.8
24 Nov 2012 10.9
24 Nov 2012 10.9
John Olorunfemi Cardinal Onaiyekan San Saturnino
111 No 22 Sep 1942 81.1
24 Nov 2012 10.9
24 Nov 2012 10.9
Rubén Cardinal Salazar Gómez San Gerardo Maiella
112 Yes 8 Nov 1945 78.0
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Vincent Gerard Cardinal Nichols Santissimo Redentore e Sant’Alfonso in Via Merulana
113 Yes 7 Mar 1949 74.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Leopoldo José Cardinal Brenes Solórzano San Gioacchino ai Prati di Castello
114 Yes 27 Jul 1957 66.3
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Gérald Cyprien Cardinal Lacroix , I.S.P.X.San Giuseppe all’Aurelio
115 Yes 22 Dec 1945 77.9
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Jean-Pierre Cardinal Kutwa Santa Emerenziana a Tor Fiorenza
116 Yes 23 Jun 1950 73.4
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Orani João Cardinal Tempesta , O. Cist.Santa Maria Madre della Providenza a Monte Verde
117 No 7 Apr 1942 81.6
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Gualtiero Cardinal Bassetti Santa Cecilia
118 Yes 29 Nov 1947 75.9
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Mario Aurelio Cardinal Poli San Roberto Bellarmino
119 Yes 5 Dec 1943 79.9
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Andrew Cardinal Yeom Soo-jung San Crisogono
120 No 7 Jan 1942 81.8
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Ricardo Cardinal Ezzati Andrello , S.D.B.Santissimo Redentore a Valmelaina
121 Yes 25 Jan 1945 78.8
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Philippe Nakellentuba Cardinal Ouédraogo Santa Maria Consolatrice al Tiburtino
122 No 11 Mar 1939 84.6
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Orlando Beltran Cardinal Quevedo , O.M.I.Santa Maria “Regina Mundi” a Torre Spaccata
123 Yes 29 Nov 1958 64.9
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Chibly Cardinal Langlois San Giacomo in Augusta
124 No 15 Feb 1933 90.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
22 Feb 2014 9.7
Kelvin Edward Cardinal Felix Santa Maria della Salute a Primavalle
125 Yes 16 Jul 1948 75.3
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Manuel José Cardinal Macário do Nascimento Clemente Sant’Antonio in Campo Marzio
126 Yes 14 Jul 1948 75.3
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Berhaneyesus Demerew Cardinal Souraphiel , C.M.San Romano Martire
127 Yes 5 May 1948 75.5
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
John Atcherley Cardinal Dew Sant’Ippolito
128 No 14 Oct 1939 84.1
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Edoardo Cardinal Menichelli Sacri Cuori di Gesù e Maria a Tor Fiorenza
129 No 1 Apr 1938 85.6
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Pierre Cardinal Nguyễn Văn Nhơn San Tommaso Apostolo
130 No 30 Jan 1939 84.8
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Alberto Cardinal Suárez Inda San Policarpo
131 Yes 29 Oct 1948 75.0
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Charles Maung Cardinal Bo , S.D.B.Sant’Ireneo a Centocelle
132 Yes 27 Jun 1949 74.4
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Francis Xavier Kriengsak Cardinal Kovithavanij Santa Maria Addolorata
133 Yes 22 May 1946 77.5
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Francesco Cardinal Montenegro Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
134 Yes 4 Jul 1959 64.3
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Daniel Fernando Cardinal Sturla Berhouet , S.D.B.Santa Galla
135 No 13 Apr 1942 81.6
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Ricardo Cardinal Blázquez Pérez Santa Maria in Vallicella
136 Yes 24 Feb 1944 79.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
José Luis Cardinal Lacunza Maestrojuán , O.A.R.San Giuseppe da Copertino
137 Yes 15 Nov 1949 74.0
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Arlindo Cardinal Gomes Furtado San Timoteo
138 Yes 19 Dec 1961 61.9
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Soane Patita Paini Cardinal Mafi Santa Paola Romana
139 No 11 Oct 1934 89.1
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Luis Héctor Cardinal Villalba San Girolamo a Corviale
140 No 27 Oct 1927 96.0
14 Feb 2015 8.7
14 Feb 2015 8.7
Júlio Duarte Cardinal Langa San Gabriele dell’Addolorata
141 Yes 14 Mar 1967 56.6
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
Dieudonné Cardinal Nzapalainga , C.S.Sp.Sant’Andrea della Valle
142 Yes 16 May 1945 78.5
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
Carlos Cardinal Osoro Sierra Santa Maria in Trastevere
143 Yes 21 Oct 1959 64.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
Sérgio Cardinal da Rocha Santa Croce in via Flaminia
144 Yes 19 Mar 1949 74.6
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
Blase Joseph Cardinal Cupich San Bartolomeo all’Isola
145 No 1 Oct 1943 80.1
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
Patrick Cardinal D’Rozario , C.S.C.Nostra Signora del Santissimo Sacramento e Santi Martiri Canadesi
146 Yes 10 Oct 1944 79.1
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
Baltazar Enrique Cardinal Porras Cardozo Santi Giovanni Evangelista e Petronio
147 Yes 17 Jun 1947 76.4
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
Jozef Cardinal De Kesel Santi Giovanni e Paolo
148 No 19 Jul 1941 82.3
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
Maurice Evenor Cardinal Piat , C.S.Sp.Santa Teresa al Corso d’Italia
149 Yes 9 Jan 1950 73.8
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
Carlos Cardinal Aguiar Retes Santi Fabiano e Venanzio a Villa Fiorelli
150 Yes 9 Feb 1957 66.7
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
John Cardinal Ribat , M.S.C.San Giovanni Battista de’ Rossi
151 Yes 3 May 1952 71.5
19 Nov 2016 7.0
19 Nov 2016 7.0
Joseph William Cardinal Tobin , C.SS.R.Santa Maria delle Grazie a Via Trionfale
152 Yes 27 Dec 1943 79.9
28 Jun 2017 6.4
28 Jun 2017 6.4
Jean Cardinal Zerbo Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Tuscolana
153 Yes 21 Apr 1946 77.5
28 Jun 2017 6.4
28 Jun 2017 6.4
Juan José Cardinal Omella Omella Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
154 Yes 24 Sep 1949 74.1
28 Jun 2017 6.4
28 Jun 2017 6.4
Anders Cardinal Arborelius , O.C.D.Santa Maria degli Angeli
155 Yes 8 Apr 1944 79.6
28 Jun 2017 6.4
28 Jun 2017 6.4
Louis-Marie Ling Cardinal Mangkhanekhoun , I.V.D.San Silvestro in Capite
156 No 3 Sep 1942 81.2
28 Jun 2017 6.4
28 Jun 2017 6.4
Gregorio Cardinal Rosa Chávez Santissimo Sacramento a Tor de’ Schiavi
157 Yes 4 Jan 1954 69.8
28 Jun 2018 5.4
28 Jun 2018 5.4
Angelo Cardinal De Donatis San Marco
158 Yes 21 Jul 1945 78.3
28 Jun 2018 5.4
28 Jun 2018 5.4
Joseph Cardinal Coutts San Bonaventura da Bagnoregio
159 Yes 5 May 1947 76.5
28 Jun 2018 5.4
28 Jun 2018 5.4
António Augusto Cardinal dos Santos Marto Santa Maria sopra Minerva
160 Yes 12 Feb 1944 79.7
28 Jun 2018 5.4
28 Jun 2018 5.4
Pedro Ricardo Cardinal Barreto Jimeno , S.J.Santi Pietro e Paolo a Via Ostiense
161 Yes 13 Jun 1954 69.4
28 Jun 2018 5.4
28 Jun 2018 5.4
Désiré Cardinal Tsarahazana San Gregorio Barbarigo alle Tre Fontane
162 Yes 19 Aug 1948 75.2
28 Jun 2018 5.4
28 Jun 2018 5.4
Giuseppe Cardinal Petrocchi San Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini
163 Yes 3 Mar 1949 74.7
28 Jun 2018 5.4
28 Jun 2018 5.4
Thomas Aquino Manyo Cardinal Maeda Santa Pudenziana
164 No 23 May 1937 86.5
28 Jun 2018 5.4
28 Jun 2018 5.4
Toribio Sergio Cardinal Porco Ticona Santi Gioacchino ed Anna al Tuscolano
165 Yes 9 Jul 1950 73.3
5 Oct 2019 4.1
5 Oct 2019 4.1
Ignatius Cardinal Suharyo Hardjoatmodjo Spirito Santo alla Ferratella
166 Yes 11 Jul 1948 75.3
5 Oct 2019 4.1
5 Oct 2019 4.1
Juan de la Caridad Cardinal García Rodríguez Santi Aquila e Priscilla
167 Yes 24 Jan 1960 63.8
5 Oct 2019 4.1
5 Oct 2019 4.1
Fridolin Cardinal Ambongo Besungu , O.F.M. Cap.San Gabriele Arcangelo all’Acqua Traversa
168 Yes 9 Aug 1958 65.2
5 Oct 2019 4.1
5 Oct 2019 4.1
Jean-Claude Cardinal Hollerich , S.J.San Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto
169 Yes 16 Jul 1947 76.3
5 Oct 2019 4.1
5 Oct 2019 4.1
Alvaro Leonel Cardinal Ramazzini Imeri San Giovanni Evangelista a Spinaceto
170 Yes 11 Oct 1955 68.1
5 Oct 2019 4.1
5 Oct 2019 4.1
Matteo Maria Cardinal Zuppi Sant’Egidio in Trastevere
171 Yes 19 May 1952 71.5
5 Oct 2019 4.1
5 Oct 2019 4.1
Cristóbal Cardinal López Romero , S.D.B.San Leone I
172 No 7 Nov 1938 85.0
5 Oct 2019 4.1
5 Oct 2019 4.1
Sigitas Cardinal Tamkevičius , S.J.Sant’Angela Merici
173 No 16 May 1939 84.5
5 Oct 2019 4.1
5 Oct 2019 4.1
Eugenio Cardinal Dal Corso , P.S.D.P.Sant’Anastasia
174 Yes 10 Nov 1958 65.0
28 Nov 2020 2.9
28 Nov 2020 2.9
Antoine Cardinal Kambanda San Sisto
175 Yes 7 Dec 1947 75.9
28 Nov 2020 2.9
28 Nov 2020 2.9
Wilton Daniel Cardinal Gregory Immacolata Concezione di Maria a Grottarossa
176 Yes 30 Mar 1952 71.6
28 Nov 2020 2.9
28 Nov 2020 2.9
Jose Fuerte Cardinal Advincula San Vigilio
177 Yes 6 Apr 1945 78.6
28 Nov 2020 2.9
28 Nov 2020 2.9
Celestino Cardinal Aós Braco , O.F.M. Cap.Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
178 Yes 1 Jul 1964 59.3
28 Nov 2020 2.9
28 Nov 2020 2.9
Augusto Paolo Cardinal Lojudice Santa Maria del Buon Consiglio
179 No 1 May 1940 83.5
28 Nov 2020 2.9
28 Nov 2020 2.9
Felipe Cardinal Arizmendi Esquivel San Luigi Maria Grignion de Montfort
180 Yes 26 Dec 1958 64.9
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Jean-Marc Noël Cardinal Aveline Santa Maria ai Monti
181 Yes 1 Mar 1963 60.7
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Peter Ebere Cardinal Okpaleke Santi Martiri dell’Uganda a Poggio Ameno
182 Yes 6 Nov 1950 73.0
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Leonardo Ulrich Cardinal Steiner , O.F.M.San Leonardo da Porto Maurizio ad Acilia
183 Yes 20 Jan 1953 70.8
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Filipe Neri António Sebastião do Rosário Cardinal Ferrão Santa Maria in Via
184 Yes 5 Feb 1954 69.7
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Robert Walter Cardinal McElroy San Frumenzio ai Prati Fiscali
185 Yes 27 Nov 1967 55.9
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Virgilio Cardinal do Carmo da Silva , S.D.B.Sant’Alberto Magno
186 Yes 1 Sep 1950 73.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Oscar Cardinal Cantoni Santa Maria “Regina Pacis” a Monte Verde
187 Yes 15 Nov 1961 62.0
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Anthony Cardinal Poola Santi Protomartiri a Via Aurelia Antica
188 Yes 20 Jul 1967 56.3
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Paulo Cezar Cardinal Costa Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
189 Yes 25 Jun 1957 66.4
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
William Cardinal Goh Seng Chye Santa Maria “Regina Pacis” in Ostia mare
190 Yes 8 Jul 1951 72.3
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Adalberto Cardinal Martínez Flores San Giovanni a Porta Latina
191 Yes 7 Jun 1974 49.4
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Giorgio Cardinal Marengo , I.M.C.San Giuda Taddeo Apostolo
192 No 29 Mar 1942 81.6
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Jorge Enrique Cardinal Jiménez Carvajal , C.I.M.Santa Dorotea
193 No 18 Jul 1942 81.3
27 Aug 2022 1.2
27 Aug 2022 1.2
Arrigo Cardinal Miglio San Clemente
194 Yes 21 Apr 1965 58.5
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Pierbattista Cardinal Pizzaballa , O.F.M.Sant’Onofrio
195 Yes 24 Sep 1956 67.1
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Stephen Cardinal Brislin Santa Maria Domenica Mazzarello
196 Yes 11 Aug 1958 65.2
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Ángel Sixto Cardinal Rossi , S.J.Santa Bernadette Soubirous
197 Yes 3 Mar 1962 61.7
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Luis José Cardinal Rueda Aparicio San Luca a Via Prenestina
198 Yes 9 Feb 1964 59.7
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Grzegorz Wojciech Cardinal Ryś Santi Cirillo e Metodio
199 Yes 10 Jan 1964 59.8
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Stephen Ameyu Martin Cardinal Mulla Santa Gemma Galgani
200 Yes 20 Sep 1965 58.1
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
José Cardinal Cobo Cano Santa Maria in Monserrato degli Spagnoli
201 Yes 31 May 1960 63.4
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Protase Cardinal Rugambwa Santa Maria in Montesanto
202 Yes 11 Nov 1951 72.0
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Sebastian Cardinal Francis Santa Maria Causa Nostrae Laetitiae
203 Yes 7 Aug 1959 64.2
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Stephen Cardinal Chow Sau-yan , S.J.San Giovanni Battista de La Salle
204 Yes 23 Nov 1968 55.0
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
François-Xavier Cardinal Bustillo , O.F.M. Conv.Santa Maria Immacolata di Lourdes a Boccea
205 Yes 12 Dec 1973 49.9
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Américo Manuel Cardinal Alves Aguiar Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Merulana
206 No 17 May 1939 84.5
30 Sep 2023 .1
30 Sep 2023 .1
Diego Rafael Cardinal Padrón Sánchez San Gaetano
Notes: Cardinals that reach the age of 80 before the day the Holy See becomes vacant may not vote in a conclave.