Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Théodore-Adrien Cardinal Sarr

Archbishop Emeritus of Dakar, Senegal

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia a Piazza d’Armi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1936 Born
28 May 196427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Dakar, Senegal
1 Jul 197437.5AppointedBishop of Kaolack, Senegal
24 Nov 197437.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kaolack, Senegal
2 Jun 200063.5AppointedArchbishop of Dakar, Senegal
24 Nov 200770.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200770.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia a Piazza d’Armi
6 Apr 200871.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia a Piazza d’Armi
22 Dec 201478.0RetiredArchbishop of Dakar, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Théodore-Adrien Sarr (VIAF: 307171655)
Théodore-Adrien Cardinal Sarr (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dakar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFadiouth
Ordained BishopS. Theophile, Cathedral, Kaolack, Diocese of Kaolack

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Dakar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast