Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Soane Patita Paini Cardinal Mafi

Bishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Paola Romana


Motto: Ke Loloto E Tui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1961 Born
29 Jun 199129.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
28 Jun 200745.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
4 Oct 200745.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
18 Apr 2008³46.3SucceededBishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
14 Feb 201553.1Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201553.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Paola Romana
5 Dec 201553.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Paola Romana

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Soane Patita Paini Mafi
Soane Patita Paini Cardinal Mafi
(born )
Bishop of Tonga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuku'alofa, Vicariate Apostolic of Tonga and Niue Islands
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception of Mary, Cathedral, Ma'ufonga, Diocese of Tonga

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Tonga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,546
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015
  • i: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025