Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Wilton Daniel Cardinal Gregory

Archbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Immacolata Concezione di Maria a Grottarossa

Apostolic Administrator of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1947 Born
9 May 197325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Oct 198335.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Oct 198335.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Oliva
13 Dec 198336.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oliva
29 Dec 199346.0AppointedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
10 Feb 199446.1InstalledBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
9 Dec 200457.0AppointedArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
17 Jan 200557.1InstalledArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
4 Apr 201971.3AppointedArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
21 May 201971.4InstalledArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
18 Sep 202072.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
28 Nov 202072.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 202072.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Immacolata Concezione di Maria a Grottarossa

MicroData Summary for Wilton Daniel Gregory (VIAF: 68261663)
Wilton Daniel Cardinal Gregory (born ) Archbishop of Washington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Washington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2019
  • i: CB, 4 Apr 2019
  • ab: CB, 18 Sep 2020
  • card: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,859
  • cpri: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast