Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephen Ameyu Martin Mulla

Archbishop of Juba, South Sudan

Apostolic Administrator of Torit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1964 Born
21 Apr 199127.2Ordained PriestPriest of Torit, South Sudan
3 Jan 201954.9AppointedBishop of Torit, South Sudan
3 Mar 201955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Torit, South Sudan
12 Dec 201955.9AppointedArchbishop of Juba, South Sudan
22 Mar 202056.1InstalledArchbishop of Juba, South Sudan
22 Mar 202056.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Torit, South Sudan
21 Sep 202056.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wau, South Sudan
24 Jan 202157.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Wau, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Stephen Ameyu Martin Mulla
Archbishop Stephen Ameyu Martin Mulla (born ) Archbishop of Juba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIdo, Archdiocese of Juba
Ordained BishopOutdoors, near, Cathedral, Torit, Diocese of Torit

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Juba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2019
  • ob: CB, 25 Jan 2019
  • c2+: CB, 3 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,111
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2019
  • i: CB, 6 Mar 2020
  • aadm: CB, 30 Mar 2020
  • aadm: CB, 21 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Apr 2021

Quantcast