Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Comastri

President Emeritus of the Fabric of St. Peter

Cardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1943 Born
11 Mar 196723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
25 Jul 199046.8AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino, Italy
12 Sep 199046.9Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino, Italy
3 Mar 199450.4ResignedBishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino, Italy
9 Nov 199653.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Loreto, Italy
5 Feb 200561.3AppointedPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
5 Feb 200561.3AppointedCoadjutor Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
31 Oct 200663.1SucceededArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
24 Nov 200764.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200764.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Salvatore in Lauro
24 May 200864.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Salvatore in Lauro
28 Feb 201369.4CeasedPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
16 Mar 201369.4ConfirmedPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
19 May 201874.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro
20 Feb 202177.4RetiredPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
20 Feb 202177.4RetiredArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}

MicroData Summary for Angelo Comastri (VIAF: 90164990)
Angelo Cardinal Comastri (born ) President Emeritus of Fabric of St. Peter

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorano, Diocese of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
Ordained PriestChurch, Sorano, Diocese of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Lungomare dei Navigatori, Porto Santo Stefano, Archdiocese of Pisa, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Fabric of St. Peter.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2005
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,076
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,288
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 May 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast