Catholic-Hierarchy DC

聲gel Sixto Cardinal Rossi, S.J.

Archbishop of C鏎doba, Argentina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Bernadette Soubirous


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1958 Born
7 Sep 197618.0EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
12 Dec 198628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 May 199435.7Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Nov 202163.2AppointedArchbishop of C鏎doba, Argentina
17 Dec 202163.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of C鏎doba, Argentina
30 Sep 202365.1Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 202365.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Bernadette Soubirous
29 Oct 202365.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Bernadette Soubirous

MicroData Summary for 聲gel Sixto Rossi
(VIAF: 14160208380048620072; WikiData: Q109429876)
聲gel Sixto Cardinal Rossi S.J. (born ) Archbishop of C鏎doba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceC鏎doba, Archdiocese of C鏎doba
Ordained BishopAtrium, Cathedral, C鏎doba, Archdiocese of C鏎doba

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of C鏎doba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2021
  • ob: CB, 6 Nov 2021
  • c2+: CB, 4 Dec 2021
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 250, Number 20,827
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2023
  • cpri: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2023
  • i: Bollettino, 23 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024