Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignace Bessi Dogbo

Archbishop of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1961 Born
2 Aug 198725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Yopougon, Côte d’Ivoire
19 Mar 200442.5AppointedBishop of Katiola, Côte d’Ivoire
4 Jul 200442.8Ordained BishopBishop of Katiola, Côte d’Ivoire
10 Jul 200442.8InstalledBishop of Katiola, Côte d’Ivoire
12 Oct 201756.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
3 Jan 202159.3AppointedArchbishop of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
14 Feb 202159.4InstalledArchbishop of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Ignace Bessi Dogbo (VIAF: 315997454)
Archbishop Ignace Bessi Dogbo (born ) Archbishop of Korhogo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiangon-Adjamé
Ordained BishopYopougon, Diocese of Yopougon

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Korhogo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,650
  • ab: CB, 12 Oct 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2021
  • i: CB, 14 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast