Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sigitas Cardinal Tamkevičius, S.J.

Archbishop Emeritus of Kaunas, Lithuania

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Angela Merici


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1938 Born
18 Apr 196223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kaunas, Lithuania
Aug 1968³29.7EnteredPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 197031.7First VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
8 May 199152.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
8 May 199152.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuda
19 May 199152.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuda
4 May 199657.4AppointedArchbishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
11 Jun 201576.5RetiredArchbishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
5 Oct 201980.9Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 201980.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angela Merici
26 Jan 202081.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angela Merici

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigitas Tamkevičius (VIAF: 10138791)
Sigitas Cardinal Tamkevičius S.J. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kaunas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGudonys, Krikstonys, Archdiocese of Kaunas
Ordained PriestSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral Basilica, Kaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Kaunas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,542
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2015
  • card: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • cpri: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Oct 2019
  • i: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast