Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Felipe Cardinal Arizmendi Esquivel

Bishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México

Cardinal-Priest of San Luigi Maria Grignion de Montfort


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1940 Born
25 Aug 196323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Toluca, México, México
7 Feb 199150.7AppointedBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
7 Mar 199150.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
31 Mar 200059.9AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
1 May 200060.0InstalledBishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
3 Nov 201777.5RetiredBishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
28 Nov 202080.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 202080.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Luigi Maria Grignion de Montfort
29 Nov 202080.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Luigi Maria Grignion de Montfort

MicroData Summary for Felipe Arizmendi Esquivel (VIAF: 21749661)
Felipe Cardinal Arizmendi Esquivel (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de Las Casas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiltepec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tapachula, Diocese of Tapachula, Chiapas

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of San Cristóbal de Las Casas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,540
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2017
  • card: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • cpri: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020
  • i: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 29 Nov 2020

Quantcast