Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Américo Manuel Cardinal Alves Aguiar

Bishop of Setúbal, Portugal

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1973 Born
8 Jul 200127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
1 Mar 201945.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
1 Mar 201945.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dagnum
31 Mar 201945.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dagnum
21 Sep 202349.7AppointedBishop of Setúbal, Portugal
30 Sep 202349.7Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 202349.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Merulana
26 Oct 202349.8InstalledBishop of Setúbal, Portugal
3 Dec 202349.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Merulana

MicroData Summary for Américo Manuel Alves Aguiar
(VIAF: 302561996; WikiData: Q61927457)
Américo Manuel Cardinal Alves Aguiar (born ) Bishop of Setúbal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeça do Balio, Diocese of Porto
Ordained BishopSantissima Trindade, Church, Porto, Diocese of Porto

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Setúbal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2019
  • ob/c1: CB, 1 Mar 2019
  • c2+: CB, 27 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,127
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2023
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2023
  • cpri: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2023
  • i: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 27 Nov 2023